FL S1772 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines the term "last known address," to conform to changes made by the act. Revises notice requirements related to enforcing an owner's lien. Allows postal notice by first-class mail, along with a certificate of mailing. Allows electronic mail notice. Clarifies provisions relating to the right to create contractual liens or limitations on liability.
Title
Self-service Storage Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 712 | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn from Community Affairs -SJ 561 | |
2011-04-26 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time -SJ 491 | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-12 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/12/11, 9:15 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Judiciary -SJ 205 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |