FL H0445 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Borinqueneer Boulevard in Orange County.
Title
Road Designation/Orange County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7093 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/445 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0445/BillText/Filed/PDF |