FL H7093 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
House Economic Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Ports Subcommittee | Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-06 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-02 | House | CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0445 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Transportation and Ports Subcommittee
S0388 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
S0388 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages