FL H0435 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Florida Is For Veterans, Inc., to serve as state's principal assistance organization under United States Department of Defense's SkillBridge program; prescribes duties of corporation to facilitate administration of SkillBridge program.
Title
Veterans Employment and Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#166 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#166 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Chapter No. 2021-66 | |
2021-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SB 586 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda |
2021-03-09 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S586 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 435 (Ch. 2021-66)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
295 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |