FL H0435 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing procedures for agencies to follow when initiating rulemaking after certain public hearings; limiting reliance upon an unadopted rule in certain circumstances; providing for publication of notices of rule development and of rules filed for adoption; conforming proceedings that oppose agency action based on an invalid or unadopted rule to proceedings used for challenging rules, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#266 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18HouseVeto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
2015-06-16 Vetoed by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-28HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-28SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 3
2015-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time 668
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 718
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-27SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (834353)
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-15HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-14HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-04-09HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-04-08HouseCS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-04-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-07HouseCS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/07/15, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2015-03-18HouseNow in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-17HouseCS by Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-11HouseCS by Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-09HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 10:00 am, 306 HOB
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-01-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0718 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120569Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
120695Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/435
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Amendment/102409/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Amendment/559205/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Amendment/429241/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Amendment/805099/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Amendment/834353/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Amendment/316098/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Vote/HouseVote_h0435e1266.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0435/Vote/SenateVote_h0435e1034.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback