FL S0718 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing procedures for agencies to follow when initiating rulemaking after certain public hearings; providing for publication of notices of rule development and of rules filed for adoption; conforming proceedings that oppose agency action based on an invalid or unadopted rule to proceedings used for challenging rules, etc.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 435 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/15, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/24/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/17/15, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0435 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 569 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |