FL H0429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons convicted of certain sexual offenses involving Internet from accessing Internet or maintaining or contracting for Internet access; provides employment exception.
Title
Sexual Offenses Involving the Internet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00042; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H --Temporarily deferred | |
2010-02-09 | On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H --Temporarily deferred | |
2009-12-18 | Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2009-12-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0932 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice