FL H0413 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
Pending: House Health And Human Services Committee
Hearing: Jan 24 @ 3:30 pm House Health & Human Services Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires nurse registry that authorizes registered nurse to delegate tasks to certified nursing assistant or home health aide to ensure certain requirements are met; authorizes registered nurse to delegate administration of duties for care of patient of nurse registry; authorizes certified nursing assistants to administer certain medication to patients of nurse registries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delegation of the Administration of Prescription Medications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2022-01-13HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-13HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseFavorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-11HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-05HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-10-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S700 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4642035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback