FL H0469 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Now in Health & Human Services Committee
Pending: House Health And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes unlicensed persons to assist patients with other specified tasks; revises provisions relating to medications & devices with which unlicensed persons may assist patients in self-administration; specifies staffing requirements for advanced life support ambulances during interfacility transfers; provides certain persons occupying such ambulances are in charge of patient care during transfers; revises list of medications that registered nurses may delegate administration of to certified nursing assistants or home health aides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Care in Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-20HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2022-01-19HouseFavorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-07HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-12-07HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-12-07HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-12-03HouseCS Filed
2021-12-03HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-12-03HouseReported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseFavorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-10HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-11-10HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-11-10HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-11-10HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-11-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S718 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400488Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640156Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/Amendment/220307/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/Amendment/703315/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/Analyses/h0469.FFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/Analyses/h0469a.FFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/Analyses/h0469b.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/469/Analyses/h0469c.PPH.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=61017&IsPCB=0&BillId=73936
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=62850&IsPCB=0&BillId=73936

Bill Comments

feedback