FL H0409 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes online notarizations; specifies requirements & standards for performance of such online notarizations; requires DOS to adopt rules by specified date.
Title
Electronic Legal Documents
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Daniel Perez [R] | Rep. James Grant [R] |
Rep. Stan McClain [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#193 (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#193 (Y: 87 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-71 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 850 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 548 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 87 NAYS 28 |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-17 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-16 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-18 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-15 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall -- Temporarily postponed |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S548 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 409 (Ch. 2019-71)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
117 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
689 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
694 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
695 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
695 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
695 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
695 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
731 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
732 | 526 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
733 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
740 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |