FL H0405 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides terminology & requirements relating to petitions & procedures for voluntary & involuntary admissions, examinations, & treatment under Baker Act & Marchman Act.
Title
Mental Health and Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Rep. Patt Maney [R] | Rep. Sam Garrison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S828 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H955 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
S1736 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
S1856 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H955 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
S1736 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
S1856 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 4655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 499 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 681 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6811 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6978 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/405 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/405/BillText/Filed/PDF |