FL H0405 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of "development" to exclude certain utility work on rights-of-way or corridors & creation or termination of distribution & transmission corridors; requires DEP to consider certain variance standard for certification of power plants & transmission corridors; specifies PSC authority to locate transmission lines underground.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Linear Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#531 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-34
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-02-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-02-21SenatePassed; YEAS 34 NAYS 4
2018-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted for SB 494
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-08SenateWithdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 105 NAYS 2
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-11HouseFavorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 1
2018-01-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 01/11/18, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-06HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2017-12-06HouseFavorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB
2017-11-15HouseNow in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
2017-11-15HouseFavorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2017-11-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2017-11-01HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S494 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 405

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback