FL S0494 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "development" to exclude work by certain utility providers on utility infrastructure on certain rights-of-way or corridors; requiring the consideration of a certain variance standard when including conditions for the certification of an electrical power plant; clarifying that the Public Service Commission has exclusive jurisdiction to require underground transmission lines, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Linear Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 405
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted HB 405
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-01-17SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by- Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2017-11-15SenateNow in Community Affairs
2017-11-14SenateFavorable by Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-10-26SenateReferred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs
2017-10-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H405 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-34

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback