FL H0401 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 1:00 pm House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "actual rental income" for certain property used for affordable housing purposes; revises ownership entities for nonprofit homes qualifying for exemption from ad valorem taxation to include certain limited partnerships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad Valorem Tax Exemption for Affordable Housing and Nonprofit Homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HousePCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-05HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-10-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S362 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
193017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1961975Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback