FL S0362 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising ownership entities for nonprofit homes qualifying for an exemption from ad valorem taxation to include certain limited partnerships, etc.
Title
Ad Valorem Tax Exemption for Nonprofit Homes for the Aged
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H401 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations