FL H0399 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits persons from driving motor vehicle in street takeover, stunt driving, race, speed competition or contest, drag race or acceleration contest, test of physical endurance, or exhibition of speed or acceleration on highway, roadway, or parking lot; provides criminal penalties for unlawful use of certain lights; authorizes court or jury to consider certain evidence in determining commission of offense of false personation.
Title
Motor Vehicle and Vessel Law Enforcement
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee | House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Anthony Rodriguez [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#715 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#715 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Chapter No. 2022-180 | |
2022-06-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-06-06 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 876 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-25 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-04 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S258 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
S876 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 399
S876 (Similar To) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 399
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 0261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |