FL H0399 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides certain entrance passes for specified military members & veterans at no charge.
Title
State Park Fee Discounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1262 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/399 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/399/BillText/Filed/PDF |