FL H0397 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to send list of certain providers of adult cardiovascular services to specified persons & entities; requires DOH to develop specified assessment tool; requires development & implementation of protocols; requires 911 public safety telecommunicators to complete CPR training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cardiovascular Emergency Protocols and Training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-14HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-12House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-12HouseCS Filed
2021-04-12HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-12HouseReported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-07HouseAdded to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-24HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseFavorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-19HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-08HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S766 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
S1568 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3953042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401465Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/Amendment/495555/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/Analyses/h0397.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/Analyses/h0397a.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/Analyses/h0397b.HCA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/397/Analyses/h0397d.HCA.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59156&IsPCB=0&BillId=70543
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60191&IsPCB=0&BillId=70543

Bill Comments 750

feedback