FL H0385 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for parenting plan relating to exchange of child; requires court to order parties to parenting plan to exchange child at neutral safe exchange location or supervised visitation program; requires sheriffs to designate areas as neutral safe exchange locations; provides immunity from liability; revises forms for injunctions for protection against domestic violence; requires court-ordered injunctions for protection against domestic violence to designate locations for exchange of child of parties.
Title
Safe Exchange of Minor Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 580 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Received |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-01-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-01-18 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-17 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Amendment 016161 adopted |
2024-01-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (1/17/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-01-11 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-08 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-22 | House | PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-12-11 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-12-06 | House | CS Filed |
2023-12-06 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-12-06 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-12-06 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-29 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-11-22 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-11-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S580 (Similar To) 2024-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 385
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |