FL H0373 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires covered entity to adopt policy relating to refused services; requires covered entity to submit complete list of refused services to DOH; requires covered entity to submit list, along with its application, if applying for certain state grants or contracts; provides penalty; requires DOH to publish list of covered entities & their refused services on its website; requires DOH to develop & administer public education & awareness program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Denial of Health Care Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-05HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-10-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1742 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381027Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback