FL H0365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DCF to establish Florida Veterans' Care Coordination Program to provide certain services to veterans & their families; authorizes DCF to contract with managing entities; requires statewide delivery of services; requires collection of program implementation data & submission of data to DCF; requires report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Services for Veterans and Their Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/21/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-15 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-13 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-25 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-02-20 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1222 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations