FL H0365 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
Status: Introduced on November 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037
Summary
Prohibits specified acts done with intent to assist career offender in eluding law enforcement agency that is seeking to find career offender to question career offender about, or to arrest career offender for, his or her noncompliance; makes prohibitions inapplicable to career offenders incarcerated in or in custody of specified facilities.
Title
Career Offenders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-14 | Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00037 | |
2009-11-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1493 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-69
S2750 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00780; Substituted CS/HB 1493 -SJ 00780; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1493 (Ch. 2010-69) -SJ 00780
S2750 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00780; Substituted CS/HB 1493 -SJ 00780; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1493 (Ch. 2010-69) -SJ 00780
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0365&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |