FL H0363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-2)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain organizations to establish programs to provide temporary respite care for child by volunteer respite families; provides requirements for & limitations to such programs.
Title
Temporary Care of a Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#87 (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-04-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 96 NAYS 16 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment(s) failed (767831, 819167) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-23 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2017-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-14 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-17 | House | Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 02/16/17, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0200 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)