FL H0359 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1606 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1606 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises electronic signature requirement for motor vehicle salvage certificate of title; authorizes payment of certain workers' compensation benefits to be transmitted to employee's account with licensed money transmitter; revises requirements & procedures for civil remedy notice provided to insurers & DFS; revises timeframe for insurer to pay damages; revises persons who may be licensed to transact in travel insurance; revises ratemaking factor for workers' compensation & employer's liability insurance; revises criteria for assessing residential condominium unit owner's loss assessment coverage; requires travel insurers to pay insurance premium tax on specified travel insurance premiums; specifies policyholder's or certificateholder's right to cancel travel protection plan for full refund.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1606 passed |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-22 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | CS referred to Commerce Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-21 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-15 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-10-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1334 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H1137 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1606 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-63
H895 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1137 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1606 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-63
H895 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 0651 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
647 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |