FL H0357 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that lien sale may be conducted on certain websites; provides that facility or unit owner is not required to hold license to post property for online sale; limits maximum value of certain property; provides options for disposition of motor vehicles or watercraft claimed to be subject to lien; authorizes facility or unit owner to charge tenant certain fees under certain conditions.
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsors
House Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee | House Careers and Competition Subcommittee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#80 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#80 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Chapter No. 2017-82 | |
2017-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 264 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2017-04-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/22/17, 9:15 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-13 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-28 | House | Now in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-02-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-22 | House | CS by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 1:15 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0264 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 357 (Ch. 2017-82)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |