FL H0345 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Criminal Justice Standards & Training Commission to implement, administer, maintain, & revise basic abilities examination by specified date; requires commission to establish specified procedures & standards & set fee for examination; provides condition for when examination fee takes effect.
Title
Criminal Justice Standards and Training Commission
Sponsors
House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Robert Asencio [D] | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Laid on Table |
2017-04-28 | House | Substituted SB 350 (Died in House returning Messages) |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/24/17, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-04-20 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-18 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-17 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-20 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-15 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0350 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |