FL H0341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires language on application form for motor vehicle registration to allow applicant to indicate that applicant has been diagnosed with, or is parent or legal guardian of child or ward who has been diagnosed with, specified disabilities or disorders; requires specified designation to be included in motor vehicle record; prohibits inclusion of specified information in motor vehicle record for certain purposes; requires DHSMV to allow specified persons to update motor vehicle registration to include or remove specified designation at any time.
Title
Designation of a Diagnosis on Motor Vehicle Registrations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#731 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#731 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 288 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024) |
2024-02-16 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2024-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2024-02-05 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-02-01 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2024-02-01 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2024-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-22 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-11-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S288 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 341
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |