FL H0339 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 602 (Ch. 2021-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 602 (Ch. 2021-13)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises circumstances under which shareholders are entitled to appraisal rights & certain payments; entitles corporations to prepay shareholder if shareholder makes demand for payment; specifies when interest is applicable to such prepayments; revises requirements for proceedings relating to unsettled demands for payment; revises eligibility requirements for shareholders entitled to fair value of shares during court proceedings.
Title
Business Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 602 (Ch. 2021-13) |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-30 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-09 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-08 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S602 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Chapter No. 2021-13
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 0410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1326 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
607 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0725 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |