FL H0339 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises qualifications for motor vehicle service agreement company to obtain & maintain license; allows certain entities to cancel service agreements in certain circumstances; provides such cancellations are only valid if authorized.
Title
Motor Vehicle Service Agreement Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#180 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#180 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Chapter No. 2017-99 | |
2017-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 794 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/09/17, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-22 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0794 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 339 (Ch. 2017-99)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
634 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |