FL H0339 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Removes housing discrimination as cause of action for certain relief & damages stemming from violations of Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992; revises requirements & conditions upon which person aggrieved by discriminatory housing practice may file complaint.
Title
Housing Discrimination
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Rep. Sharon Pritchett [D] | Rep. Cynthia Stafford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-26 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-10-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7008 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |