FL H0339 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires acceptance of federal write-in absentee ballot for voter registration when ballot contains certain information; requires counting of absentee ballots cast by overseas voters in election if received within 10 days after election & legal; revises printed instructions which accompany absentee ballot, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Domino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00035; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped | |
2010-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 02/17/10, 8:30 am, Webster Hall --Workshopped | |
2009-12-10 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-11-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2486 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0097 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 6103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 6923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 6925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 694 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0101 | 6956 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0102 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |