FL H0337 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides legislative findings & intent relating to construction or upgrade of facilities by private entities which are used predominately for public purpose; requires public entities to develop & adopt guidelines governing procedures & criteria for selection of projects & public-private agreements; provides procurement procedures; provides project-approval requirements; provides project qualifications & process; provides for notice to affected local jurisdictions; provides for interim & comprehensive agreements between public & private entities; provides for use fees; provides for private financing requirements; provides powers & duties for private entities; provides for expiration or termination of agreements; provides for applicability of sovereign immunity for public entities with respect to qualified projects; provides construction.
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsors
House Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] | House State Affairs Committee | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1062 (Y: 95 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; Budget -SJ 841 | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 95 NAYS 20 -HJ 1079 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1079 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1025 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 907 | |
2012-02-27 | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time -HJ 847 | |
2012-02-27 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-24 | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3 -HJ 855 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/24/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-02-23 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 812 | |
2012-02-22 | CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 735 | |
2012-02-22 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-21 | CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 -HJ 738 | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/21/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-02 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 455 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 455 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 35 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 35 | |
2011-10-11 | Filed |