FL H0333 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises legislative intent relating to Rural Economic Development Initiative (REDI); redefines term "rural area of opportunity"; revises duties, responsibilities, & membership of REDI; revises reporting requirements.
Title
Rural Economic Development Initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-30 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-29 | House | CS by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-28 | House | CS by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3177 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
257 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 06561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 06561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2818 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 2819 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/333 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0333/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/333/BillText/c1/PDF |