FL H0329 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, & Mobile Homes to create, maintain, & update publicly-accessible Internet database of condominium & homeowners' associations in state by specified date; requires certain information to be included in database; requires legislative appropriation from Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, & Mobile Homes Trust Fund to create, operate, & maintain database.
Title
Community Association Databases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-05 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-05 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-10-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S642 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 5041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 4012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/329 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/329/BillText/Filed/PDF |