FL H0325 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes physician assistants & ARNPs to initiate involuntary examinations under Baker Act of persons believed to have mental illness.
Title
Involuntary Examinations under the Baker Act
Sponsors
House Health Quality Subcommittee | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] | Rep. Rene Plasencia [R] | Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] |
Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#531 (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 4 |
2016-02-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16 |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-21 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/21/16, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 12/02/15, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-11-19 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-11-17 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-17 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 10:00 am, 306 HOB |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-10-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0572 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 496 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 972 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |