FL H0323 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain forms relating to boating under influence be provided by FWCC rather than DHSMV; authorizes certain athletic teams & sports to operate human-powered vessel within specified waterway; revises authorized conditions for determining vessels at risk of becoming derelict; prohibits municipalities & counties from designating public bathing beach & swim areas within specified waterway; repeals provisions relating to derelict vessels & relocation & removal of such vessels; authorizes FWCC to provide derelict vessel grants to local governments; requires FWCC to adopt rules; authorizes FWCC employees & Florida Forest Service to operate drones for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-01 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-07HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-07HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-12-07HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-03HouseCS Filed
2021-12-03HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-12-03HouseReported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseFavorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-05HouseNow in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
2021-10-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S494 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
327371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3792412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93450Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback