FL S0494 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Chapter No. 2022-142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Chapter No. 2022-142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring lead land managing agencies, in consultation with the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission, to consider the use of state lands as gopher tortoise recipient sites in certain management plans; requiring the commission, subject to appropriation, to encourage the establishment of gopher tortoise recipient sites on private lands and to create an online dashboard for certain gopher tortoise recipient site information; revising the notices a person must be given for failure to submit to certain tests for alcohol, chemical substances, or controlled substances; authorizing individuals, when participating in certain athletic team practices or competitions, to operate a human-powered vessel within the marked channel of the Florida Intracoastal Waterway under certain circumstances; prohibiting municipalities and counties from designating certain waters adjacent to designated public bathing beaches or swim areas as vessel exclusion zones, etc.
Title
Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Environment and Natural Resources Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#859 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#731 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#731 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Chapter No. 2022-142 | |
2022-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | Amendment 658216 Concur |
2022-03-10 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2022-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (031891) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (658216) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 1 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Amendment 031891 adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 323 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-10 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (289912) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/12/22, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-11-30 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H323 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 494
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 35215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 4107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
705 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |