FL H0323 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 230 (Ch. 2013-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 230 (Ch. 2013-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that Governor adopt protocol on flag display; requires protocol to have guidelines for proper flag display & for lowering state flag to half-staff on certain occasions; authorizes Governor to adopt, repeal, or modify any rule or custom as Governor deems appropriate which pertains to display of state flag.
Title
Flag Etiquette
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Edwards [D] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Sen. Shevrin Jones [D] | Rep. Kionne McGhee [D] |
Rep. George Moraitis [R] | House State Affairs Committee | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 230 (Ch. 2013-165) |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted SB 230 |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-01 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-28 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-18 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/18/13, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0230 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-165