FL H0319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Board of Psychology to certify specified psychologists to exercise prescriptive authority; requires board to develop procedures & adopt rules relating to prescriptive authority certification; requires each applicant for renewal to complete continuing education; requires prescribing psychologist who is authorized to prescribe controlled substances to file his or her federal Drug Enforcement Administration registration number; requires Board of Psychology to transmit specified information to the Board of Pharmacy.
Title
Prescriptive Authority Certification for Psychologists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-26 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-10-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S540 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/319 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/319/BillText/Filed/PDF |