FL H0317 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Referred to Ways and Means Committee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Section 6 of Article VII & creation of new section in Article XII of State Constitution to authorize Legislature, by general law, to provide homestead tax exemption from school district levies to persons age 65 or older who have legal or equitable title to homestead property & who have maintained permanent residence thereon for at least 25 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Tax Exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee
2019-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S344 (Same As) 2019-01-25 - Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
S562 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback