FL H0315 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes district school boards & charter school governing boards to allow specified number of mental health days as excused absences for students.
Title
Enforcement of School Attendance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-10-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S588 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/315 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/315/BillText/Filed/PDF |