FL H0313 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Rules and Calendar Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 6, Art. VII & creation of s. 31, Art. XII of State Constitution to expand availability of property tax discount on homesteads of veterans who became disabled as result of combat injury to include those who were not Florida residents when they entered military & schedule amendment to take effect January 1, 2011.
Title
Disabled Veterans' Property Tax Discount
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Rules and Calendar Council | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable by Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00207; Now in Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00207 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00033; On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 02/17/10, 1:30 pm, 404-H; Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00170; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00170; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-01 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H | |
2010-02-18 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-17 | Favorable by Finance & Tax Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-10 | On Council agenda-- Finance & Tax Council, 02/17/10, 1:30 pm, 404-H | |
2009-11-20 | Referred to Finance & Tax Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council | |
2009-11-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0196 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
007 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
012 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |