FL S0196 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution to expand the availability of the property tax discount for disabled veterans to veterans who were not Florida residents when they entered the military.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanded Property Tax Discount/Disabled Veterans [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00023; On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 01/20/10, 10:00 am, 37-S; Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00162; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 412-K; Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00162; Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00162
2010-02-03 Now in Finance and Tax
2010-02-02 Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2010-01-22 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/10, 8:15 am, 412-K
2010-01-21 Now in Community Affairs
2010-01-20 Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2010-01-12 On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 01/20/10, 10:00 am, 37-S
2009-12-09 Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2009-10-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0313 (Similar To) -

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00706Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback