FL H0305 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Citizens Oversight Council within DOC; specifies duties & responsibilities concerning adult & juvenile correctional facilities of DOC & DJJ; requires Florida Commission on Offender Review & DOC to jointly develop voluntary long-term inmate program; requires program to be offered to male & female inmates; requires program to provide evidence-based programming.
Title
Correctional Facility Oversight and Programming
Sponsors
Rep. Dianne Hart [D] | Rep. Travaris McCurdy [D] | Rep. Felicia Simone Robinson [D] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-26 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H169 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S1168 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1168 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 0232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/305 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/305/BillText/Filed/PDF |