FL H0283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits drilling or exploration for, or production of, oil, gas, or other petroleum products & permitting & construction of certain related structures; requires statewide renewable energy electricity & carbon emission reductions by specified dates; directs Office of Energy within DACS to develop unified statewide plan; requires state & public entities to cooperate as requested; provides plan requirements; requires office to submit plan & updates to Governor & Legislature; creates Renewable Energy Advisory Committee within Office of Energy; directs Commissioner of Agriculture to submit specified annual report to Legislature.
Title
State Renewable Energy Goals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H333 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S720 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S722 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S720 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S722 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
366 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 8225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/283 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/283/BillText/Filed/PDF |