FL H0267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Temporarily postponed
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides criteria for submission of tentative & final budgets by county constitutional officers; requires tentative budget of county constitutional officer to be posted on county's website; provides criteria for submission of tentative & final budgets by property appraiser & tax collector; requires tentative & final budgets to be posted on website of property appraiser or tax collector.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budgets of County Constitutional Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2019-03-12HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-15HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S696 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
129021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
195087Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback