FL H0257 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-22 - Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes juveniles from numerous provisions relating to court fees; provides that fees & court-ordered costs previously ordered to be paid are unenforceable & uncollectable; provides for reinstatement of driver licenses suspended for failure to make specified payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elimination of Court-related Financial Obligations for Juveniles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-22HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-10-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S428 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
S870 (Similar To) 2021-11-30 - Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
938085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93829Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
939185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985514Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback