FL H0253 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria for renewal of Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program awards to include minimum number of volunteer service work hours; provides applicability; specifies requirements for eligible volunteer service work; prohibits use of hours earned from certain work to satisfy requirement; requires written & signed documentation of earned volunteer service work hours; provides exception for student who enlists in military service.
Title
Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0540 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/253 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0253/BillText/Filed/PDF |