FL H0227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that wrongfully incarcerated person who was convicted & sentenced to death on or before December 31, 1979, is exempt from certain application procedures for compensation if special prosecutor issues nolle prosequi after reviewing conviction; provides alternative application procedures; requires claimant to file application within specified time; requires application to include certain information & documents; provides that claimant is entitled to compensation if requirements met; prohibits compensation from being used for specified fees & costs; provides for repeal on specified date; requires CFO to issue payment to insurance company or other financial institution authorized to issue annuity contracts to purchase annuity or annuities selected by wrongfully incarcerated person; requires CFO to execute all necessary agreements; requires wrongfully incarcerated person to sign waiver before application approved.
Title
Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#51 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#754 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#754 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-198 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-05-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 326 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-21 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/21/14, 8:30 am, Webster Hall |
2014-04-17 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-04-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-08 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 04/08/14, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-10-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0326 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 227 (Ch. 2014-198)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |