FL H0227 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State -HJ 01700
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to preserve authority of Governor to retain command & control of Florida National Guard & to reject any changes to federal law which would restrict or diminish authority of Governor to activate Florida National Guard in response to domestic crisis, disaster, or other emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Control of Florida National Guard by Governor [GPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State -HJ 01700
2010-04-26 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01092
2010-04-23 Withdrawn from Military Affairs and Domestic Security -SJ 00781; Substituted for SM 480 -SJ 00781; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; CS adopted -SJ 00781
2010-04-21 In Messages; Received -SJ 00720; Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security -SJ 00720
2010-04-21 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00814; CS adopted -HJ 00814
2010-04-17 Original reference(s) removed: Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council; Referred to- Calendar -HJ 00760
2010-04-16 -HJ 00727; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-04-16 CS by Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00732; CS read 1st time on
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council -HJ 00027
2009-11-01 Referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council
2009-10-14 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0480 (Similar To) 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00781; Substituted CS/HM 227 -SJ 00781; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 227 (Adopted) -SJ 00781

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback